Seneca Growth Capital VCT Directorate Change
11 Octobre 2023 - 4:39PM
UK Regulatory
TIDMHYG TIDMSVCT TIDMHYG
Directorate Change
Seneca Growth Capital VCT Plc (the "Company")
11 October 2023
Appointment of Non-Executive Director
The Board of Seneca Growth Capital VCT Plc is delighted to
announce that Ian Dighe was today appointed to the Board as
non-executive Director of the Company. Ian has also joined the
Company's Audit Committee.
Ian has significant listed company experience, particularly in
the investment banking, corporate broking, asset management and
closed-end funds sectors. He was a co-founder of Bridgewell Group
plc and was Chairman of Miton Group plc from February 2011,
overseeing the successful refinancing and subsequent growth of the
group. He retired from the Miton board in December 2017. He is
Chairman of The Investment Company plc, an independent director of
Edelweiss Holdings plc, and a director of a number of private
companies and charities.
Ian will stand for election at the Annual General Meeting of the
Company to be held in 2024.
Disclosure pursuant to Listing Rule 9.6.13: Mr Ian Robert Dighe
was a Director of AVPE Investments Limited which entered
administration on 5 February 2021. The trading entities were
successfully sold and AVPE Investments Limited was dissolved on 14
December 2021.
There is no additional information required to be disclosed
pursuant to Listing Rule 9.6.13 in relation to the appointment of
Ian.
For further information, please contact:
John Hustler, Seneca Growth Capital VCT Plc at
john.hustler@btconnect.com
Richard Manley, Seneca Growth Capital VCT Plc at
Richard.Manley@senecapartners.co.uk
(END) Dow Jones Newswires
October 11, 2023 10:39 ET (14:39 GMT)
Copyright (c) 2023 Dow Jones & Company, Inc.
Seneca Growth Capital Vct (LSE:HYG)
Graphique Historique de l'Action
De Août 2024 à Sept 2024
Seneca Growth Capital Vct (LSE:HYG)
Graphique Historique de l'Action
De Sept 2023 à Sept 2024